+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor