+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities