+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 4, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5088
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 02:45 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
- Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2019 from 11:30 AM-02:45 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor