+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 504235/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Carozza) Adopted
- Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Carozza) Adopted
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
504235/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor