+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {394939/1 Report Adopted
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
394939/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor