+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Judiciary
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (43-0)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-101 - Article - Criminal Procedure
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2013: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 28, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 43
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor