+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {334436/1 Report Adopted
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
334436/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2017: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 1, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 134
March 2, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
February 27, 2017: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor