+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (136-2)
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 347178/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
347178/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2018: House - Committee - Appropriations
March 26, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 2
March 17, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
March 16, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor