+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor