+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (86-52)
- Special Order until next session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Delegate Turner) {143929/1 Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {945864/1 Report Adopted
On April 9, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Ways and Means
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (31-14)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {393827/1 Withdrawn
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {393827/1
- Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Conway) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {393827/1
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Conway) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {393827/1
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Raskin) Adopted
- Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {393827/1
- Favorable with Amendments {544932/1 Report Adopted
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {544932/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 26, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor