+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (45-1)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-6)
- Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Holmes) Adopted (130-3)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {130415/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-1)
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {744038/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 10-415 - Article - Natural Resources
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
April 1, 2014: House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Holmes) Adopted
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 3
April 1, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 125
- Nays: 6
March 30, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor