+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (124-6)
- Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (109-12)
- Second Reading Passed
- Committee Amendment {665367/1 Withdrawn
- Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
- Favorable with Amendments {665367/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-1)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
665367/01
Withdrawn
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2013: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 1, 2013: House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Kaiser) Adopted
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 12
April 1, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 6
March 20, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1