+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Membership and Benefits
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - State Retirement and Pension System - Membership and Benefits
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (134-0)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {304760/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Referred Appropriations
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Optional Retirement Program - Membership
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {449738/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Text - First - Optional Retirement Program - Membership
- Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 23-407, 30-302, 30-303, 30-307 - Article - State Personnel and Pensions
+ − Votes (5)
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (134-0)
- Yeas: 134
March 17, 2020: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 11, 2020: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 9, 2020: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
February 6, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor