+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-1102.1 - Article - Environment
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
March 27, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 11, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor