+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Public Health – Behavioral Health Programs and Health Care Facilities – Safety and Community Relations Plans
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 801
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Health and Government Operations
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Public Health – Behavioral Health Programs and Health Care Facilities – Safety and Community Relations Plans
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {577475/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Text - First - Public Health – Behavioral Health Programs and Health Care Facilities – Safety and Community Relations Plans
- Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 19-1C-01, 19-2301, 7.5-402 - Article - Health - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2021: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
- Yeas: 137
February 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
February 5, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
December 23, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor