+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Text - Third - Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies
- Favorable Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Frederick County - Board of Education - Vacancies
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-5B-01 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2022: Third Reading Passed (132-0)
- Yeas: 132
March 21, 2022: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor