+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
On October 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 11-801 - Article - Labor and Employment
- 11-802 - Article - Labor and Employment
- 11-803 - Article - Labor and Employment
- 11-804 - Article - Labor and Employment
- 11-805 - Article - Labor and Employment
- 11-806 - Article - Labor and Employment
- 11-807 - Article - Labor and Employment
- 11-808 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2016: House - Committee - Economic Matters
April 5, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
January 28, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
January 25, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
January 25, 2016: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor