+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (141-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Passed Enrolled
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Delegates Dumais, Anderson, and Proctor
- Conference Committee Appointed
- House Refuses to Recede
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Senate Requests House Recede
- Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments {952311/2 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (134-2)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Judiciary
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {468078/1 Report Adopted
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 141
April 7, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
April 6, 2016: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 30, 2016: House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Vallario) Adopted
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 2
March 24, 2016: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor