+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 28, 2019: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 14, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor