+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred Economic Matters
On March 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-0)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
- First Reading Finance
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-1101, 5-1102, 5-1103, 5-1104 through 5-1110 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2020: Third Reading Passed (44-0)
- Yeas: 44
February 7, 2020: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor