+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {118975/1 Report Adopted
- Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {118975/1
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred Judicial Proceedings
- Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Raskin) Adopted
- Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Raskin) Adopted
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
118975/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (44)
- 10-301 - Article - Family Law
- 10-302 - Article - Family Law
- 10-303 - Article - Family Law
- 10-304 - Article - Family Law
- 10-306 - Article - Family Law
- 10-307 - Article - Family Law
- 10-308 - Article - Family Law
- 10-309 - Article - Family Law
- 10-310 - Article - Family Law
- 10-311 - Article - Family Law
- 10-312 - Article - Family Law
- 10-312.1 - Article - Family Law
- 10-312.2 - Article - Family Law
- 10-313 - Article - Family Law
- 10-316 - Article - Family Law
- 10-317 - Article - Family Law
- 10-318 - Article - Family Law
- 10-319 - Article - Family Law
- 10-320 - Article - Family Law
- 10-322 - Article - Family Law
- 10-323 - Article - Family Law
- 10-325 - Article - Family Law
- 10-328 - Article - Family Law
- 10-329 - Article - Family Law
- 10-330 - Article - Family Law
- 10-331 - Article - Family Law
- 10-332 - Article - Family Law
- 10-335 through 10-337 - Article - Family Law
- 10-339 - Article - Family Law
- 10-340 - Article - Family Law
- 10-341 - Article - Family Law
- 10-342 - Article - Family Law
- 10-343 - Article - Family Law
- 10-344 - Article - Family Law
- 10-345 - Article - Family Law
- 10-346 - Article - Family Law
- 10-347 - Article - Family Law
- 10-348 - Article - Family Law
- 10-349 - Article - Family Law
- 10-350 - Article - Family Law
- 10-353.1 - Article - Family Law
- 10-354 through 10-366 - Article - Family Law
- 10-354 - Article - Family Law
- 10-355 through 10-359 - Article - Family Law
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2015: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
April 3, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor