+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Kagan) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted (30-15)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {614234/1
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments {614234/1
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Text - First - Public Ethics - Issue Lobbying Communications - Lobbyist Registration and Disclosure Requirements
- Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-701, 5-702, 5-705, 5-717, 5-718 - Article - General Provisions
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2020: Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kagan) Adopted (30-15)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 15