+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (36-10)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
- Passed Enrolled
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-21)
- Floor Committee Amendment 600717/1 Adopted
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments 650515/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Floor Committee Amendment 550919/1 Adopted
- Special Order until 04/06 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading Environment and Transportation
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (36-10)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 214231/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
April 1, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 10
March 30, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 21