+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Environmental Matters
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {774631/2 Report Adopted
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 1/23 at 2:45 p.m.
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On September 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pre-filed
+ − Amendment
774631/02
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 15-205 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2014: House - Committee - Environmental Matters
March 25, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 135
February 4, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
January 30, 2014: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor