+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn by Sponsor
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing canceled
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State and Local Agencies
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Statute Amended
- 3A-101, 3A-315 - Article - State Finance and Procurement
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor