+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statute Amended
- 9-1A-27 - Article - State Government
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2013: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 29, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 21, 2013: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 21, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor