+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (139-0)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {797376/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
797376/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 30, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 18, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 17, 2017: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor