+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-0)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Ways and Means
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {849830/1 Report Adopted
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
849830/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 2-113 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2014: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 29, 2014: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 133
March 12, 2014: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 12, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor