+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Human Services - Critical Medical Needs Program - Application for Assistance
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 381
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-1)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Referred Economic Matters
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Human Services - Critical Medical Needs Program - Application for Assistance
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {237576/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Human Services - Critical Medical Needs Program - Application for Assistance
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-5A-08 - Article - Human Services
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2021: Third Reading Passed (132-1)
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 1
March 19, 2021: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 18, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
February 11, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor