+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 765
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (44-1)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 914163/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
- Hearing 4/08 at 1:30 p.m.
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (33-13)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 159139/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2019: House - Committee - Appropriations
April 3, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
April 2, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 37
March 18, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor