+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 456788/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 207678/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2018: House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
April 4, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
April 2, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 139
March 29, 2018: Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor