+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - University System of Maryland - Student Fees - Review and Spending
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Referred Appropriations
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Student Fees - Review and Spending
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {184136/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - University System of Maryland - Student Fees - Review and Retention
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-109 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
- Yeas: 138
March 19, 2021: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 18, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
February 12, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor