+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (132-0)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {327775/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
327775/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2013: House - Committee - Economic Matters
April 1, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 132
March 22, 2013: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 21, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor