+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Transfer With Success Act
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (135-0)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Appropriations
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
- Referred Appropriations
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Transfer With Success Act
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {124636/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Text - First - Transfer With Success Act
- Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 11-207 - Article - Education
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2021: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
- Yeas: 135
March 16, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 12, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
February 10, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor