+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Economic and Community Development - Income Tax Credit for Catalytic Revitalization Projects and Historic Revitalization Tax Credit
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Economic and Community Development - Income Tax Credit for Catalytic Revitalization Projects and Historic Revitalization Tax Credit
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-4)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {415268/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Ways and Means
- Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
- Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {179639/1 Adopted
- Text - Third - Economic and Community Development - Income Tax Credit for Catalytic Revitalization Projects
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Economic and Community Development - Income Tax Credit for Catalytic Revitalization Projects
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 1-101, 6-801 through 6-805 - Article - Housing and Community Development
- 10-751 - Article - Tax - General
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
April 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (133-4)
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 4
March 22, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 22, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
February 11, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor