+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Appropriations
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (44-2)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {979230/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Amendment
979230/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2015: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 2