+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
- Text - Chapter - Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (114-21)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments {734439/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Text - Third - Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
- Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 4-2801 through 4-2806 - Article - Housing and Community Development
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (114-21)
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 21
April 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
April 9, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
February 12, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
February 12, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor