+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unannounced Visits by Inspectors
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 536
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (133-1)
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Referred Economic Matters
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unannounced Visits by Inspectors
- Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
- Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unannounced Visits by Inspectors
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Statute Amended
- 27-102, 27-205 - Article - Alcoholic Beverages
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2021: Third Reading Passed (133-1)
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 1
March 18, 2021: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Yeas: 47
March 16, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
February 12, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor