+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (31-14)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (85-48)
- Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
- Special Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
- Favorable with Amendments 763292/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (33-14)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Finance
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
763292/01
Adopted
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-507.2 - Article - Labor and Employment
+ − Votes (4)
March 24, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 14
March 23, 2018: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 19, 2018: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 48