+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate Rules
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
Type:
Primary Sponsor