+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 454
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-1)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (103-30)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {443492/1 Adopted
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
- Referred Economic Matters
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Text - Third - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
- Favorable Report by Finance
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
- Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
- First Reading Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 5-5A-08 - Article - Human Services
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-1)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
March 30, 2021: Third Reading Passed (103-30)
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 30
March 19, 2021: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 19, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
February 10, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor