+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Chapter - Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
- Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Enrolled - Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concurs House Amendments
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (96-41)
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {280116/1 Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
- Referred Environment and Transportation
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Text - Third - Southern Maryland – Multifamily Dwelling Registration – Fees and Fines
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Adopted
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
- Text - First - Southern Maryland – Multifamily Dwelling Registration – Fees and Fines
- Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 12-203 - Article - Public Safety
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2021: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Yeas: 46
April 9, 2021: Third Reading Passed (96-41)
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 41
March 19, 2021: Third Reading Passed (45-0)
- Yeas: 45
March 16, 2021: Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
February 9, 2021: Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
+ − Sponsor
Charles County Senators
Type:
Primary Sponsor