+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {335663/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
335663/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2016: House - Committee - Ways and Means
March 29, 2016: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
March 27, 2016: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 136
February 29, 2016: Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor