+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (140-0)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Economic Matters
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading Economic Matters
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2017: House - Committee - Economic Matters
March 23, 2017: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 140
March 8, 2017: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
+ − Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
Type:
Primary Sponsor