+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Enrolled
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
- Senate Concur - House Amendments
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {205963/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments {344136/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2013: House - Committee - Ways and Means
April 4, 2013: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
April 2, 2013: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor