+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading Ways and Means
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (47-0)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2018: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 47
March 15, 2018: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor