+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (137-0)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 249533/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
- Hearing canceled
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Budget and Taxation
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
249533/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2019: House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
March 24, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 137
March 18, 2019: Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
March 17, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor