+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned Passed
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed (138-0)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Judiciary
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Favorable Report by Judiciary
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (42-0)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
- Favorable with Amendments 688778/1 Report Adopted
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
688778/01
Adopted
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 5, 2019: House - Committee - Judiciary
March 30, 2019: House Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 138
March 28, 2019: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 25, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 42
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor