+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (46-0)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed
- Favorable Report Adopted
- Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading Judicial Proceedings
+ − Statute Amended
- 3-607 - Article - Criminal Law
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2014: Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
March 19, 2014: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 46
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor