+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing canceled
- Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
- Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed (45-0)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Reading Passed with Amendments
- Favorable with Amendments 927971/1 Report Adopted
- Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading Finance
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
927971/01
Adopted
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2019: Senate - Committee - Finance
March 29, 2019: Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed
- Yeas: 45